EP0021524 - Apparatus for measuring the lubrication of surfaces rolling or sliding relative to each other and lubricated with a lubricant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/01] | Device for measuring the lubrication of surfaces rolling or sliding relative to each other and lubricated with a lubricant | ||
[1985/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1986 [1986/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF Industrial Trading & Development Co, B.V. Postbus 50 NL-3430 AB Nieuwegein / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states SKF Industrial Trading & Development Co, B.V. Postbus 50 NL-3430 AB Nieuwegein / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolfsma, Hendrik Strawinskystraat 94 Nieuwegein / NL | 02 /
Heemskerk, Rutgerus S. Olmenstraat 2 Vianen / NL | 03 /
Vermeiren, Karel N. Jasmijnlaan 7 Woerden / NL | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Merkelbach, B. SKF Engineering & Research Centre B.V. P.O. Box 2350 3430 DT Nieuwegein / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Merkelbach, B. SKF Engineering & Research Centre B.V. P.O. Box 2350 NL-3430 DT Nieuwegein / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200568.6 | 17.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | NL19790005026 | 28.06.1979 Original published format: NL 7905026 | [1981/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021524 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021524 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01M13/00, G01B11/06 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
F16N29/00 (EP);
G01B7/144 (EP);
G01M13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Messen der Schmierung relativ zueinander rollender oder gleitender, mit einem Schmiermittel geschmierter Oberflächen | [1981/01] | English: | Apparatus for measuring the lubrication of surfaces rolling or sliding relative to each other and lubricated with a lubricant | [1985/22] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer la lubrification de surfaces roulant ou glissant l'une par rapport à l'autre, et lubrifiées par un lubrifiant | [1981/01] |
Former [1981/01] | Device for measuring the lubrication of surfaces rolling or sliding relative to each other and lubricated with a lubricant | Examination procedure | 02.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 30.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/25] | Request for further processing for: | 08.03.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.04.1984 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3176286 [ ]; | US3000101 [ ] |