EP0021536 - Luminescent silicate, luminescent screens and lamps comprising such a luminescent silicate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1984 [1984/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konijnendijk, Willem Leendert c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Verlijsdonk, Johannus Godefridus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Looye, Bob c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Marie, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200589.2 | 20.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | NL19790004953 | 26.06.1979 Original published format: NL 7904953 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021536 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021536 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/46, C09K11/475, H01J61/44 | [1982/46] | CPC: |
C09K11/7774 (EP);
C09K11/77742 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/01] | C09K11/475, C09K11/46, H01J61/44 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | Lumineszierendes Silikat, ein solches lumineszierendes Silikat enthaltende lumineszierende Schirme und Lampen | [1981/01] | English: | Luminescent silicate, luminescent screens and lamps comprising such a luminescent silicate | [1981/01] | French: | Silicate luminescent et écran et lampes luminescents comprenant un tel silicate luminescent | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 15.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1804546 [ ] (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | DE1924160 [ ] (THORN ELECTRICAL IND LTD); | FR2089918 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | DE2218178 [ ]; | US4052329 [ ] (FUKUDA YOJI, et al) |