EP0021545 - Abrasive-containing liquid detergent compositions and non-clogging dispensing package therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.10.1985 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuthill, Lyle Brown 3315 Westside Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45208 / US | 02 /
Fitzgerald, Esther Ruth 3371 Hamilton-New London Hamilton Ohio 45013 / US | 03 /
Mitchell, Sharon Janosik 7951 Hunters Ridge Drive West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | 04 /
Spinner, Jonathan 8428 Arundel Court Cincinnati Ohio 45231 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Ernst, Hubert, et al PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Ernst, Hubert, et al PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 80200610.6 | 26.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | US19790053162 | 29.06.1979 Original published format: US 53162 | US19800110148 | 07.01.1980 Original published format: US 110148 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021545 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021545 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/14, C11D1/83, C11D3/12, B65D47/26, B65D1/32 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B65D35/44 (EP);
B65D47/121 (EP);
B65D47/128 (EP);
B65D47/268 (EP);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D17/0013 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D3/14 (EP);
C11D1/143 (EP);
C11D1/146 (EP);
C11D1/22 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | Scheuermittel enthaltende flüssige Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzungen und sich nicht verstopfender Ausgabebehälter dafür | [1981/01] | English: | Abrasive-containing liquid detergent compositions and non-clogging dispensing package therefor | [1981/01] | French: | Compositions détergentes liquides contenant un abrasif et récipient distributeur ne se bouchant pas pour celles-ci | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/36] | 16.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.07.1984
13.08.1984
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV Unilever House, Blackfriars/Weena 455 London EC4P 4BQ/3013 AL Rotterdam / GB Opponent's representative Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Unilever Intellectual Property Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [1984/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.07.1984
13.08.1984
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC / Unilever N.V. Unilever House,Blackfriars / Burgmeesters' Jacobplein 1 London EC4 4BQ GB/ NL-3000 DK Rotterdam, NL / GB Opponent's representative Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 28.08.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.07.1985 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1986/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.10.1983 | [1986/32] | Documents cited: | Search | US3981421 [ ]; | DE2844399 [ ]; | US4129527 [ ]; | FR2356719 [ ]; | EP0008805 [ ]; | DE2739776 [ ]; | EP0009942 [ ]; | US3227332 [ ] |