EP0022598 - Measuring feeler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta A.G. Ebauches-Fabrik Schildruststrasse 17 CH-2540 Grenchen (Canton de Soleure) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/03] | For all designated states Eta A.G. Ebauches-Fabrik Schildruststrasse 17 CH-2540 Grenchen (Canton de Soleure) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauert, Ulrich im Gässli 301 CH-3253 Schnottwil/SO / CH | [1981/03] | Representative(s) | Bovard, Fritz Albert, et al Bovard & Cie Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | [1981/03] | Application number, filing date | 80200658.5 | 07.07.1980 | [1981/03] | Priority number, date | CH19790006644 | 17.07.1979 Original published format: CH 664479 | [1981/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0022598 | Date: | 21.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0022598 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022598 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/00, G01B7/00, B23Q35/26 | [1981/03] | CPC: |
B23Q35/26 (EP,US);
G01B3/002 (EP,US);
G01B5/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1981/03] | Title | German: | Tastkopf | [1981/03] | English: | Measuring feeler | [1981/03] | French: | Palpeur de mesure | [1981/03] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/30] | 03.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB532167 (OSCAR EMANUEL ROSEN); | [X]GB692642 (FREDERICK WILLIAM ARMYTAGE); | [X]DE1627123 (SCHERK JOACHIM) |