EP0023062 - Hart butter fat composition, its preparation and use in chocolate manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/04] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cotton, Wyatt Daniel 670 Hillgrove Court Cincinnati Ohio 45246 / US | 02 /
Morgan, John Wallis 1573 Acreview Drive Cincinnati Ohio45240 / US | [1981/04] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/04] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 80200668.4 | 09.07.1980 | [1981/04] | Priority number, date | US19790058713 | 18.07.1979 Original published format: US 58713 | [1981/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023062 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A23D5/00, A23G1/00 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
A23G1/36 (EP);
A23D9/00 (EP);
A23G1/38 (EP);
C11C3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/04] | Title | German: | Hartbutter-Fettzusammensetzung, ihre Herstellung und ihre Anwendung in der Schokoladefabrikation | [1981/04] | English: | Hart butter fat composition, its preparation and use in chocolate manufacture | [1981/04] | French: | Composition de graisse pour beurre dur, sa préparation et son utilisation dans la fabrication du chocolat | [1981/04] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 04.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1390936 [ ]; | FR2300795 [ ]; | USRE28737E [ ]; | FR2178146 [ ]; | FR2225096 [ ]; | GB1252224 [ ]; | US3410881 [ ] | [ ] - FETTE-SEIFEN-ANSTRICHMITTEL, Vol. 7, No. 8, published in August 1970 Berlin, DE C.J. SOETERS, "Das physikalische Verhalten und die chemische Zusammensetzung vonSchokolade, Kakaobutter und einigen Kakaobutter-Austauschfetten", pages 711-718 * Page 714, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 714, column 2, paragraph 3; tables 6,7,10,11 * |