EP0045822 - Cylindrical magnetron sputtering cathode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/07] | Cylindrical magnetron sputtering cathode, as well as sputtering apparatus provided with such cathode | ||
[1985/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/07] | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zega, Bogdan 67, rue de Lyon CH-1203 Geneva / CH | [1982/07] | Representative(s) | Dousse, Blasco 73, Avenue de Mategin 1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/07] | Dousse, Blasco 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 80200753.4 | 08.08.1980 | [1982/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045822 | Date: | 17.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045822 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, H01J37/34 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
H01J37/3405 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/07] | C23C15/00, H01J37/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/07] | Title | German: | Zylindrische Magnetron-Zerstäuberkathode | [1985/22] | English: | Cylindrical magnetron sputtering cathode | [1985/22] | French: | Cathode de pulvérisation à magnétron cylindrique | [1985/22] |
Former [1982/07] | Zylindrische Magnetron-Zerstäuberkathode sowie Zerstäubungsgerät, das mit einer derartigen Kathode ausgestattet ist | ||
Former [1982/07] | Cylindrical magnetron sputtering cathode, as well as sputtering apparatus provided with such cathode | ||
Former [1982/07] | Cathode de pulvérisation à magnétron cylindrique, ainsi qu'appareil de pulvérisation muni d'une telle cathode | Examination procedure | 16.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/34] | 26.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US4169031 [ ] (BRORS DANIEL L); | US4175030 [ ] (BOWEN ALAN W [US], et al); | US4179351 [ ] (HAWTON JOHN T JR [US], et al) | Examination | DE2707144 |