EP0026952 - Cable comprising optical fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1985 [1985/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/15] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Hoek, Willem c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Tuin, Hermanus Nicolaas c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1981/15] | Representative(s) | Auwerda, Cornelis Petrus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1981/15] | Application number, filing date | 80200925.8 | 01.10.1980 | [1981/15] | Priority number, date | NL19790007433 | 08.10.1979 Original published format: NL 7907433 | [1981/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026952 | Date: | 15.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026952 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/16 | [1981/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/4407 (EP,US);
G02B6/4405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/15] | Title | German: | Kabel mit optischen Fasern | [1981/15] | English: | Cable comprising optical fibres | [1981/15] | French: | Câble comportant des fibres optiques | [1981/15] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/17] | 22.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE659346 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | FR2337411 [ ] (LIGNES TELEGRAPH TELEPHON [FR]); | DE2740162 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) | Examination | DE2459997 | DE2519680 | US4039248 | FR2404236 | EP0022036 | - Proceedings of the 27th International Wire and Cable Symposium, Vol. 27(1978), pages 404-410 |