EP0028849 - Non-aqueous, built liquid detergent composition and method for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1984 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1981/20] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bus, Jan Van Ostadelaan 85 NL-2923 AL Krimpen a/d IJssel / NL | 02 /
Möhlmann, Willem Michael Maria Kornoeljedreef 67 NL-3137 BS Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
Pritchard, Norman Jason Zweerslaan 32 NL-3723 HP Bilthoven / NL | [1981/20] | Representative(s) | van Gent, Jan Paulus, et al Unilever N.V., Patent Division Postbus 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | van Gent, Jan Paulus, et al Unilever N.V., Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200987.8 | 20.10.1980 | [1981/20] | Priority number, date | GB19790038986 | 09.11.1979 Original published format: GB 7938986 | [1981/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028849 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028849 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/00 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
C11D17/0004 (EP,US);
C11D3/3765 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/20] | Title | German: | Nicht-wässrige, einen Komplexbildner enthaltende flüssige Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1981/20] | English: | Non-aqueous, built liquid detergent composition and method for preparing same | [1981/20] | French: | Composition détergente liquide non aqueuse contenant un adjuvant actif et procédé pour sa préparation | [1981/20] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 08.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2200779 [ ] (GAF CORP); | DE2236870 [ ] (UNILEVER NV); | US3794605 [ ] (DIEHL F); | DE2531194 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG); | DE2722988 [ ] (UNILEVER NV); | DE2745275 [ ] (UNILEVER NV) |