EP0030747 - 2-Equivalent yellow-forming colour couplers, their use in the production of photographic colour images, and photographic elements containing such couplers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.1982 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monbaliu, Marcel Jacob Neuris 9 B-2510 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Van Poucke, Rapael Ringlaan 22 B-2600 Berchem / BE | [1981/25] | Application number, filing date | 80201054.6 | 07.11.1980 | [1981/25] | Priority number, date | GB19790042111 | 06.12.1979 Original published format: GB 7942111 | [1981/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030747 | Date: | 24.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/36 | [1981/25] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP);
C07D233/90 (EP);
C07D233/92 (EP);
G03C7/30535 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1981/25] | Title | German: | 2-Äquivalent-Gelbkuppler, ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung photographischer Farbbilder und diese Kuppler enthaltende photographische Elemente | [1981/25] | English: | 2-Equivalent yellow-forming colour couplers, their use in the production of photographic colour images, and photographic elements containing such couplers | [1981/25] | French: | Coupleurs formateurs de jaune à 2 équivalents, leur utilisation dans la production d'images photographiques en couleurs, et éléments photographiques contenant de tels coupleurs | [1981/25] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/34] | 31.05.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4049458 [ ] |