EP0029274 - Screw cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. Verenigde Kunststof Bedrijven (V.K.B.) Flat "Triton" Havendijk 505 NL-3114 EK Schiedam / NL | [1981/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Visser, Willem Flat "Triton" Havendijk 503 NL-3114 EK Schiedam / NL | [1981/21] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | Donné, Eddy M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Anvers / BE | Application number, filing date | 80201085.0 | 14.11.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | BE19790058221 | 20.11.1979 Original published format: BE 58221 | [1981/21] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0029274 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0029274 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
B65D41/0421 (EP);
B65D41/3447 (EP);
B65D2401/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/21] | Title | German: | Schraubkappe | [1981/21] | English: | Screw cap | [1981/21] | French: | Capuchon à vis | [1981/21] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/39] | 23.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/36] | 25.05.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2306896 [ ] (GRUSSEN JEAN [FR]); | US3881627 [ ] (DAVOLT RONALD L); | [X]FR2300715 (GOURNELLE MAURICE [FR]); | EP0004500 [ ] (CAPTOCAP LTD [LI]); | DE2530699 [ ] (ZELLER PLASTIK KOEHN GRAEBNER); | GB2046720 [ ] (WIEDMER PLASTIKFORM W) |