EP0013619 - Postal scale with weight-to-period transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/15] | Scale with weight-to-period transducer | ||
[1983/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1984 [1984/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. Walter H. Wheeler, Jr. Drive Stamford Connecticut 06926 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES, INC. Walter H. Wheeler, Jr. Drive Stamford Connecticut 06926 / US | ||
Former [1980/15] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0790 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Check Jr., Frank Thomas 508 Grassy Hill Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | 02 /
Schubert, Keith Eric 4 Timothy Road West Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1982/28] |
Former [1980/15] | Cook, Anthony John D. YOUNG & CO. 10, Staple Inn London, WC1V 7RD / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300074.4 | 08.01.1980 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | US19790001622 | 08.01.1979 Original published format: US 1622 | [1980/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013619 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013619 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/00, G01G3/16, G01G23/37 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
G01G3/13 (EP,US);
G01G19/005 (EP,US);
G01G23/3707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/15] | G01G19/00, G01G3/13, G01G23/37 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/15] | Title | German: | Postwaage mit Gewicht-Periode-Wandler | [1983/29] | English: | Postal scale with weight-to-period transducer | [1983/29] | French: | Balance postale à transducteur poids-période | [1983/29] |
Former [1980/15] | Waage mit Gewicht-Periode-Wandler | ||
Former [1980/15] | Scale with weight-to-period transducer | ||
Former [1980/15] | Balance à transducteur poids-période | Examination procedure | 25.09.1980 | Examination requested [1980/25] | 09.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1341667 [ ] (CIE IND DES TELEPHONES); | GB1085684 [ ] (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG); | US3960227 [ ] (ZUCKER FREDRIC E, et al) |