Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] |
31.05.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] |
24.08.1984 | Change - representative | published on 24.10.1984 [1984/43] |
19.08.1981 | Change - designated states | published on 21.10.1981 [1981/42] |
01.07.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.09.1981 [1981/35] |
30.05.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.07.1981 [1981/30] |