EP0032607 - Fare computation and dispatching method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/30] | Paratransit fare computation and dispatching method | ||
[1986/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1987 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baumann, Dwight M. 4516 Henry Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/30] | For all designated states Baumann, Dwight M. 4516 Henry Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/30] | Representative(s) | Allsop, John Rowland, et al 10 London End Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 2JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | Allsop, John Rowland European Patent Attorney, et al 10 London End Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 2JH / GB | ||
Former [1981/30] | Rowe, Eric Nielsen Edward Evans & Co. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300185.8 | 19.01.1980 | [1981/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032607 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032607 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G07B13/00, G06F15/50 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
G07B13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1981/42] |
Former [1981/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Fahrpreisberechnungs- und Fahrdienstleitungsverfahren | [1986/29] | English: | Fare computation and dispatching method | [1986/29] | French: | Méthode de calcul du prix d'un transport et de dispatching | [1986/29] |
Former [1981/30] | Transitfahrpreisberechnungs- und Fahrdienstleitungsverfahren | ||
Former [1981/30] | Paratransit fare computation and dispatching method | ||
Former [1981/30] | Système de calcul du prix d'un transport et système dispatcheur | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LU, NL | 16.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/35] | 04.07.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Request for further processing for: | 25.02.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.1984 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 19.01.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3736408 [ ]; | US4009375 [ ]; | FR1590348 [ ]; | CA983624 [ ] | [ ] - AFCET, Traffic Control and Transportation Systems, 16-21 September 1974, pages 121-131 Monte Carlo, MC. Proceedings of the IFAC-IFIP-IFORS Symposium, Proc. 2 North Holland 1974, Amsterdam, NL. K.K. REBIBO: "A computer controlled Dial-a-ride system" * page 121, Abstract * | [ ] - 29th IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, Arlington Heights, 27-30 March 1979, pages 307-308 Conference Record of papers presented at the 29th Annual Conference, published by IEEE INC. New York, U.S.A. O.BILLSTROM: "A taxi communication system" * Complete document * | [ ] - ELECTRONICS, Vol. 47, No. 3, 7th February 1974, pages 39-40 "Digital transmission over radio links helps hail taxis" * Complete document * |