EP0014562 - Pyridazines for use in treating fungal infections, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, and processes for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
SE
Pfizer Corporation Calle 15 1/2 Avenida Santa Isabel Colon / PA | [N/P] |
Former [1980/17] | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
SE
Pfizer Corporation Calle 15 1/2 Avenida Santa Isabel Colon / PA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gymer, Geoffrey Edward 19 Palmer Road Wingham Canterbury, Kent / GB | 02 /
Richardson, Kenneth 48 St. Stephens Hill Canterbury Kent / GB | [1980/17] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/17] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300275.7 | 30.01.1980 | [1980/17] | Priority number, date | GB19790003421 | 31.01.1979 Original published format: GB 7903421 | [1980/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014562 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014562 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/18, C07F3/06, A61K31/50, // C07D237/14 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
C07F3/003 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D237/14 (EP);
C07D237/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/17] | Title | German: | Pyridazine zur Verwendung bei der Behandlung fungaler Infektionen, pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen, die sie enthalten, und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1980/17] | English: | Pyridazines for use in treating fungal infections, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, and processes for their preparation | [1980/17] | French: | Pyridazines pour l'emploi dans le traitement des infections fongiques, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant et procédés pour leur préparation | [1980/17] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 03.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 20.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.10.1983 | CH | 05.10.1983 | FR | 05.10.1983 | IT | 05.10.1983 | NL | 05.10.1983 | SE | 05.10.1983 | LU | 31.01.1984 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 05.10.1983 | |
CH | 05.10.1983 | ||
IT | 05.10.1983 | ||
NL | 05.10.1983 | ||
SE | 05.10.1983 | ||
GB | 30.01.1984 | ||
LU | 31.01.1984 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.10.1983 | |
CH | 05.10.1983 | ||
IT | 05.10.1983 | ||
NL | 05.10.1983 | ||
SE | 05.10.1983 | ||
GB | 30.01.1984 | ||
Former [1989/31] | BE | 05.10.1983 | |
CH | 05.10.1983 | ||
NL | 05.10.1983 | ||
SE | 05.10.1983 | ||
GB | 30.01.1984 | ||
Former [1984/28] | BE | 05.10.1983 | |
CH | 05.10.1983 | ||
NL | 05.10.1983 | ||
SE | 05.10.1983 | ||
Former [1984/21] | BE | 05.10.1983 | |
CH | 05.10.1983 | ||
SE | 05.10.1983 | ||
Former [1984/08] | CH | 05.10.1983 | |
SE | 05.10.1983 | ||
Former [1984/06] | SE | 05.10.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | GB2025416 [ ] (PFIZER LTD) | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, No. 9, 1962, pages 393-396 Oxford, G.B. R.N. CASTLE et al.: "The nucleophilic displacement of halogen in pyridazines with phosphorus pentasulfide" * Whole article * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Perkin Transactions I, 1977, pages 1038-1044 London, G.B. G.B. BARLIN et al.: "Tautomerism in N-Heterocycles. Part 3. 3,4,5-Trimercaptopyridazine" * Whole article * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 83, No. 8, 25th August 1975, page 846, No. 70824j Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. J.S. DWIVEDI et al.: "3,4,5-Pyridazine trithiol as a complexing agent. Complexes of gold (III), lead (II), cadmium (II), silver (I), thallium (I), and mercury (II)" & INDIAN J. CHEM. 1975, 13(5), 501-3 * Abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 79, No. 16, 22th October 1973, page 555, No. 99984q Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. J.S. DWIVEDI et al.: "3,4,5-Pyridazinetrithiol complexes of copper (II), nickel (II), cobalt (II), iron (III), and chromium (III)" & J. INORG. NUCL. CHEM. 1973, 35(7), 2229-36 * Abstract * |