Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | |
07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
29.10.1982 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.12.1982 [1982/52] |
17.02.1981 | Change - request for examination | published on 22.04.1981 [1981/16] |
22.08.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.10.1980 [1980/22] |
24.06.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.08.1980 [1980/17] |