EP0018702 - Improvements in and relating to noise blanking circuitry in a radio receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1980/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beesley, Graham E. 20 Kings Orchard East Oakley, Hants / GB | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Newens, Leonard Eric, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [1980/23] | Application number, filing date | 80300343.3 | 06.02.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | GB19790014881 | 30.04.1979 Original published format: GB 7914881 | [1980/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018702 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
H03G3/341 (EP,US);
H03G3/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1980/23] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Störsignalaustastung in einem Radioempfänger | [1980/23] | English: | Improvements in and relating to noise blanking circuitry in a radio receiver | [1980/23] | French: | Circuit pour éliminer le bruit dans un récepteur radio | [1980/23] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 17.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.10.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1983/14] | 20.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/14] | 12.08.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/49] | Appeal following examination | 08.08.1986 | Appeal received No. J0031/86 | 14.10.1986 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.02.1984 | Appeal received No. J0031/86 | 23.05.1984 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.08.1987 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 23.02.1983 | Date of receipt | 19.01.1984 | Request rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3284714 [ ] (BATTIN JOHN W, et al); | US3699457 [ ] (WRIGHT LARRY R); | US3979679 [ ] (BUSH JOHN A, et al) | [ ] - FUNKTECHNIK, 27. Jahrgang, Nr. 23/1972, München und Heidelberg VERLAG FUR RADIO-FOTO-KINOTECHNIK-GMBH " Autoradio mit elektronischer Störaustastung ", Pages 867, 868 * Page 867, fig. 4 * |