EP0014587 - Clutch release mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/17] | Improvements in clutch release mechanisms | ||
[1984/05] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.12.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHP Group plc New Street Chelmsford Essex CM1 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/17] | For all designated states RHP Group plc New Street Chelmsford Essex CM1 1PU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tune, George Albert 79 Bell Lane Ackworth, Nr. Pontefract Yorkshire / GB | [1980/17] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/17] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300344.1 | 06.02.1980 | [1980/17] | Priority number, date | GB19790004056 | 06.02.1979 Original published format: GB 7904056 | [1980/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014587 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014587 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/14 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
F16C27/04 (EP);
F16D23/14 (EP);
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C2361/43 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/17] | Title | German: | Kupplungs-Freigabemechanismus | [1984/05] | English: | Clutch release mechanism | [1984/05] | French: | Mécanisme de débrayage | [1984/05] |
Former [1980/17] | Verbesserungen an Kupplungs-Freigabemechanismen | ||
Former [1980/17] | Improvements in clutch release mechanisms | ||
Former [1980/17] | Perfectionnements aux mécanismes de débrayage | Examination procedure | 03.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 15.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 23.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.10.1984
03.12.1984
ADMISSIBLE SKF GmbH Postfach 14 40 D-97404 Schweinfurt / DE | [1985/27] |
Former [1984/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.10.1984
ADMISSIBLE SKF GmbH Postfach 14 40 D-97404 Schweinfurt / DE | 04.12.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.03.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.03.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 15.05.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.09.1986 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1987/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.02.1984 | LU | 29.02.1984 | [1999/52] |
Former [1985/16] | BE | 01.02.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2183472 [ ]; | FR2347571 [ ]; | FR2364364 [ ]; | FR2345621 [ ]; | FR1597553 [ ]; | GB2006377 [ ] |