|
10.12.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1986 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.1986 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1986 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1986 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.03.1986 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1985 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1985 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.1985 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
24.10.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.1984 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1983 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1983 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.1983 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1983 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1983 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.1983 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1983 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.02.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.1983 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1983 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1983 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.1982 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1982 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1982 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.1980 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1980 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.1980 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1980 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
14.02.1980 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.02.1980 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |