Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0014587
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.11.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
12.12.1986 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 28.01.1987 [1987/05] |
26.04.1985 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 03.07.1985 [1985/27] |
11.02.1985 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.04.1985 [1985/16] |
25.10.1984 |
Opposition filed |
published on 27.12.1984 [1984/52] |
03.12.1983 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.02.1984 [1984/05] |
28.01.1983 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.03.1983 [1983/13] |
17.02.1981 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.04.1981 [1981/16] |
24.06.1980 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.08.1980 [1980/17] |