EP0015714 - Alkali metal thermoelectric generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.08.1983 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
Former [1980/19] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
Ford France Société Anonyme 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunt, Thomas Kintzing 3420 Andover Ann Arbor Michigan 48105 / US | [1980/19] | Representative(s) | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/19] | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300590.9 | 28.02.1980 | [1980/19] | Priority number, date | US19790016240 | 28.02.1979 Original published format: US 16240 | [1980/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0015714 | Date: | 17.09.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0015714 | Date: | 18.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20 | [1980/19] | CPC: |
H01G9/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/19] | Title | German: | Thermoelektrischer Generator mit Alkali-Metall | [1980/19] | English: | Alkali metal thermoelectric generator | [1980/19] | French: | Générateur thermo-électrique à métal alcalin | [1980/19] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/35] | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/41] | 12.01.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/41] | Appeal following examination | Appeal received No. T37/83 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4042757 (JONES IVOR WYNN); | US4135040 [ ] (THORNTON ROY F) | [AD] - ENERGY CONVERSION, vol. 14, no. 1, 1974, Oxford GB, N. WEBER: "A Thermoelectric device based on beta-alumina solid electrolyte"page 1-8. |