EP0016565 - 1,2,4-Triazole derivatives, processes for their production and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1985 [1985/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Clarges House 6-12 Clarges Street London W1Y 8DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clitherow, John Watson 54, Gilers Sawbridgeworth Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Bradshaw, John 22 Whitely Close Dane End, Ware Hertfordshire / GB | 03 /
Price, Barry John 155 Ware Road Hertford Hertfordshire / GB | 04 /
Martin-Schmith, Michael "Leycroft", The Street Haultwick Dane End Ware Hertfordshire / GB | 05 /
Mackinnon, John Wilson Macfarlane 13 Parklands Royston Hertfordshire / GB | 06 /
Judd, Duncan Bruce 61 Musley Lane Ware Hertfordshire / GB | 07 /
Hayes, Roger 117 Warren Way Digswell Welwyn Hertfordshire / GB | 08 /
Carey, Linda 15 Roan Walk Royston Hertfordshire / GB | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300617.0 | 29.02.1980 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | GB19790007423 | 02.03.1979 Original published format: GB 7907423 | GB19790007421 | 02.03.1979 Original published format: GB 7907421 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016565 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016565 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/14, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, A61K31/41, // (C07D401/12, 249:14, 211:70),(C07D405/12, 249:14, 307:54),(C07D409/12, 249:14, 333:24) | [1980/20] | CPC: |
C07D295/096 (EP);
C07D249/08 (KR);
C07D249/14 (EP);
C07D307/52 (EP);
C07D317/22 (EP);
C07D333/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL, SE [1984/21] |
Former [1980/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | 1,2,4-Triazol-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1980/20] | English: | 1,2,4-Triazole derivatives, processes for their production and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1980/20] | French: | Dérivés du triazole-1,2,4, procédés pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1980/20] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 18.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3681374 [ ] (YANO NOBUMITSU, et al); | US3813400 [ ] (BOYLE J, et al); | US4076938 [ ] (BOHNER BEAT, et al); | US4089962 [ ] (HARRISON ROGER GARRICK, et al); | US4104381 [ ] (DURANT GRAHAM JOHN, et al); | DE2917026 [ ] (GLAXO GROUP LTD) | Examination | DE2734070 | DE2821409 | DE2821410 |