EP0015738 - Bearing assemblies for conveyor rollers fitted with end covers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF (U.K.) LIMITED Sundon Park Road Luton Bedfordshire LU3 3BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/19] | For all designated states SKF (U.K.) LIMITED Sundon Park Road Luton Bedfordshire LU3 3BL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greener, Brian 18 Marsden Green Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Pedder, Simon Julian 11 Ranock Close Luton Bedfordshire / GB | 03 /
Forknall, John Pollard 49 Wilbury Drive Dunstable Bedfordshire / GB | [1980/19] | Representative(s) | McCulloch, Norman Little, et al Mathys & Squire 10 Fleet Street London EC4Y 1AY / GB | [1980/19] | Application number, filing date | 80300644.4 | 04.03.1980 | [1980/19] | Priority number, date | GB19790008395 | 09.03.1979 Original published format: GB 7908395 | [1980/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015738 | Date: | 17.09.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015738 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F16C13/02, B65G39/09 | [1980/19] | CPC: |
B65G39/09 (EP,US);
F16C13/022 (EP,US);
F16C33/76 (EP,US);
F16C33/80 (EP,US);
F16C35/073 (EP,US);
F16C35/077 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1980/19] | Title | German: | Lageranordnungen für mit Endkappen ausgerüstete Förderrollen | [1980/19] | English: | Bearing assemblies for conveyor rollers fitted with end covers | [1980/19] | French: | Aménagements de paliers pour rouleaux transporteurs munis de capuchons d'extrémité | [1980/19] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 28.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1441716 (INTERROLL FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH); | DE2740302 [ ] (BRIDGE BEARINGS); | DE1894140U [ ] (ROTA ACHILLE [IT], et al); | CH411476 [ ] (STAR KUGELHALTER GMBH DT [DE]); | GB1147911 [ ] (MINING ENGINEERING COMPANY MEC); | [A]DE7316666U ; | [A]GB1478993 (BROCKHOUSE CONVEYOR BEARINGS) |