EP0016586 - Data processing system with multiple logical space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1982 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakane, Keiichi 22-8 Honcho-4-chome Kokubunki-shi / JP | 02 /
Kamuichi, Toshiro 540-40, Josuiminamimachi Kodaira-shi / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Keijiro 14-C102, Sukegawacho-5-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Ellis, Edward Lovell, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 80300679.0 | 06.03.1980 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | JP19790026865 | 07.03.1979 Original published format: JP 2686579 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016586 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F9/46 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
G06F12/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/20] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungssystem mit mehreren logischen Räumen | [1980/20] | English: | Data processing system with multiple logical space | [1980/20] | French: | Système de traitement de données avec plusieurs espaces logiques | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 07.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/46] | 15.09.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4037214 [ ]; | US4037215 [ ]; | FR1580604 [ ]; | GB1234431 [ ]; | US3504349 [ ] | [ ] - COMPUTER, Vol. 7, No. 11, November 1974, pages 24-38 Long BeachU.S.A. I. FLORES: "Lookahead control in the IBM system 370 model 165" * Page 27 * | [ ] - COMPUTER DESIGN, Vol. 12, No. 12, December 1973pages 75-81 Concord K.J. HAMER HODGES: "A fault-tolerant multiprocessor design for real-time control" * Page 7 8 * |