EP0017363 - Knock-out systems for foundries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BCIRA Alvechurch Birmingham, B48 7QB / GB | [1980/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayliss, Colin Richard 4 Chapel Road Astwood Bank Redditch, Worc's / GB | [1980/21] | Representative(s) | Duncan, Angus Henry, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | Duncan, Angus Henry, et al Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300781.4 | 13.03.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | GB19790010556 | 27.03.1979 Original published format: GB 7910556 | [1980/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017363 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017363 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B22D29/02 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
B22D29/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1983/14] |
Former [1980/21] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Ausrüttel-Einrichtungen für Giessereiformen | [1980/21] | English: | Knock-out systems for foundries | [1980/21] | French: | Installations pour vider les moules de fonderie | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/24] | 30.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1223508 [ ]; | FR604320 [ ]; | US1747485 [ ] (PICKOP GEORGE B); | DE901235 [ ] (LOSENHAUSENWERK DUESSELDORFER) |