EP0019349 - Stabilizing composition for polyarylene esters, stabilized polyarylene ester, moulded article produced therefrom and process for stabilizing a polyarylene ester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1984 [1984/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard 40E St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rademacher, Leo Edward 111 Meadowbrook Road Springfield Massachusetts 01128 / US | [1980/24] | Representative(s) | Pearson, John Lionel, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | Pearson, John Lionel, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 80300926.5 | 25.03.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | US19790024926 | 29.03.1979 Original published format: US 24926 | [1980/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019349 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019349 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/52, C08L67/02, // (C08K5/52, 5:29) | [1980/24] | CPC: |
C08K5/524 (EP,US);
C08G18/4222 (EP,US);
C08G63/195 (EP,US);
C08K5/29 (EP,US);
C08K5/32 (EP,US);
C08K5/52 (EP,US);
C08K5/527 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/29, C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/32, C08L67/02 (US,EP);
C08K5/524, C08L67/02 (US,EP);
C08K5/527, C08L67/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/24] | Title | German: | Stabilisierungszusammensetzung für Polyarylenester, stabilisierter Polyarylenester, hieraus hergestellte Formkörper und Verfahren zum Stabilisieren eines Polyarylenesters | [1980/24] | English: | Stabilizing composition for polyarylene esters, stabilized polyarylene ester, moulded article produced therefrom and process for stabilizing a polyarylene ester | [1980/24] | French: | Composition stabilisante pour esters polyarylène, ester polyarylène stabilisé, article moulé fabriqué à partir de celui-ci et procédé pour stabiliser un ester polyarylène | [1980/24] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 24.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1523027 [ ] (UNITIKA LTD); | DD78381 [ ]; | GB1363935 [ ] (FIBER INDUSTRIES INC); | US3580886 [ ] (STEWART MARY J, et al) |