EP0017451 - Apparatus and method for producing a gas in liquid dispersion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.1981 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMINEER, INC. P.O. Box 1123 Dayton Ohio 45401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | For all designated states CHEMINEER INC. P.O. Box 1123 Dayton, Ohio 45401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donaldson, Charles B. 223 Western Avenue Brookville Ohio / US | [1980/21] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300991.9 | 28.03.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | US19790025303 | 30.03.1979 Original published format: US 25303 | [1980/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017451 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
C02F3/1284 (EP);
B01F23/233 (EP);
B01F23/23362 (EP);
C02F3/205 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Begasen von Flüssigkeiten | [1980/21] | English: | Apparatus and method for producing a gas in liquid dispersion | [1980/21] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la production d'une dispersion de gaz dans un liquide | [1980/21] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/06] | 17.11.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE7802091U [ ]; | GB1381968 [ ] (KAELIN J R); | DE2500225 [ ] (ATARA CORP); | US3969446 [ ] (FRANKLIN JR GROVER C); | US3915887 [ ] (OKABE AKIO, et al); | US3452966 [ ] (SMOLSKI LUDWIK); | US4074363 [ ] (CROFT JOHN C); | GB1254179 [ ] (POLCON CORP [CA]); | GB1282389 [ ] (PRECEDES SEM [FR]); | US3852384 [ ] (BEARDEN J) |