EP0021559 - A reclining chair mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.10.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leggett & Platt, Incorporated 600 West Mound Street Carthage Missouri 64836 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states Leggett & Platt, Incorporated 600 West Mound Street Carthage Missouri 64836 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crum, Michael A. 2400 Spann Lane La Grange, Kentucky 40031 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80301034.7 | 01.04.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | US19790050700 | 21.06.1979 Original published format: US 50700 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0021559 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0021559 | Date: | 18.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/035 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
A47C1/0355 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1981/01] | Title | German: | Mechanismus für verstellbaren Stuhl | [1981/01] | English: | A reclining chair mechanism | [1981/01] | French: | Mécanisme pour siège inclinable | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 16.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/17] | 01.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/49] | 06.09.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4108491 [ ] (ROGERS JR WALTER CLARK) |