EP0022363 - Position or movement sensor, e.g. for conveyances such as lifts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.09.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SELTRUST ENGINEERING LIMITED Fleet House 57/61 Clerkenwell Road London ECIM 5SP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | For all designated states SELTRUST ENGINEERING LIMITED Fleet House 57/61 Clerkenwell Road London ECIM 5SP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaller, Ronald William 16, Breton House Barbican London, E.2. / GB | [1981/02] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302273.0 | 04.07.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | GB19790023672 | 06.07.1979 Original published format: GB 7923672 | [1981/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022363 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34, G01D5/48 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
G01D5/48 (EP,US);
B66B1/3492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, SE [1981/02] | Title | German: | Positions- oder Bewegungsdetektor, z.B. für Beförderungsmittel wie Aufzüge | [1981/02] | English: | Position or movement sensor, e.g. for conveyances such as lifts | [1981/02] | French: | Détecteur de position ou de mouvement, par ex. pour installations de transport telles qu'ascenseurs | [1981/02] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 24.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/36] | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/47] | 19.08.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU176372 [ ]; | US3648228 [ ] (PERRY ADOLPHUS R); | US3757330 [ ] (HOTSTON E); | FR2192344 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | DE2610127 [ ] (KISSLING ROLAND DIPL ING) | [ ] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, Vol. 12, 28th October 1976 Stevenhage GB N.A. MACKAY et al.: "High-resolution guided RADAR system", pages 583, 584. * The whole document * |