EP0022364 - Apparatus and method for replacement of file folders having fasteners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATAFILE LIMITED 130 Sparks Avenue Willowdale Ontario M2H 2S4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | For all designated states DATAFILE LIMITED 130 Sparks Avenue Willowdale Ontario M2H 2S4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barber, Donald T. 38 Servington Crescent Toronto Ontario / CA | 02 /
Pfeffer, George B. 12825 Muriel Road Minnetonka Minnesota / US | 03 /
Olsen, Esther E. 8164 Hillside Trail Cottage Grove Minnesota / US | [1981/02] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Bernard, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | Fisher, Bernard, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302274.8 | 04.07.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | US19790053561 | 05.07.1979 Original published format: US 53561 | [1981/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022364 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022364 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B25C11/00 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
B25C11/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49822 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53683 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/02] | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zum Auswechseln von Aktendeckeln, die mit Heftklammern befestigt sind | [1981/02] | English: | Apparatus and method for replacement of file folders having fasteners | [1981/02] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour remplacer des couvertures de dossiers fixées par des agrafes | [1981/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 15.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2623729 [ ] (SELBY ESTON L); | US3528643 [ ] (MUNSON WHITNEY K, et al) |