EP0023783 - Data recovery circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yeager, Larry James 513 Municipal Drive Thorndale Pennsylvania / US | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | Pitkin, Robert Wilfred, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | Pitkin, Robert Wilfred, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302405.8 | 17.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | US19790058804 | 19.07.1979 Original published format: US 58804 | [1981/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023783 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/09 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
G11B20/1423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/06] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Wiedergewinnung von Daten | [1981/06] | English: | Data recovery circuit | [1981/06] | French: | Circuit de récupération de données | [1981/06] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/15] | 20.01.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4065796 ; | [A]US4017806 ; | [A]US4017803 ; | [AD]US4141046 |