EP0026966 - Apparatus for standards conversion of colour television signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1985 [1985/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION Broadcasting House London W1A 1AA / GB | [1981/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke, Christopher Keith Perry 3 Stumblets Pound Hill, Crawley West Sussex RH10 4TR / GB | [1981/15] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1981/15] | Application number, filing date | 80302444.7 | 18.07.1980 | [1981/15] | Priority number, date | GB19790034695 | 05.10.1979 Original published format: GB 7934695 | [1981/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026966 | Date: | 15.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026966 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/42, H04N5/02 | [1981/15] | CPC: |
H04N7/0135 (EP,US);
H04N11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1981/15] | Title | German: | Apparat zur Normenumsetzung von Farbfernsehsignalen | [1981/15] | English: | Apparatus for standards conversion of colour television signals | [1981/15] | French: | Dispositif de conversion de normes de signaux de télévision en couleurs | [1981/15] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 28.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1191500 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]); | [A]GB1270552 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP]); | [A]GB1306130 ; | [A]GB1362191 (INDEP BROADCASTING AUTHORITY); | [A]GB2013067 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP) | [AD] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, Vol. 113, No 6, June 1966, London W. WHARTON, R. E. DAVIES "Fieldstore standards conversion" pages 989-996 |