EP0023790 - Friction clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 16.02.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau GmbH Industriestrasse 3 D-77813 Bühl / DE | [1988/44] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states Laycock Engineering Limited Archer Road Millhouses Sheffield S8 0JY / GB | ||
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau GmbH Industriestrasse 3 D-77813 Bühl / DE | ||
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states Laycock Engineering Limited Archer Road Millhouses Sheffield S8 0JY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senior, Laurence Peter 15, St.Albans Close SHeffield S10 4DJ / GB | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1988/44] |
Former [1988/42] | Dodd, Graham Marshall, et al Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 55 Ipsley House Ipsley Church Lane Redditch Worcestershire B98 0TL / GB | ||
Former [1988/19] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie HASELTINE LAKE & CO. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | ||
Former [1985/04] | Dodd, Graham Marshall Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 55 Ipsley House Ipsley Church Lane Redditch Worcestershire B98 0TL / GB | ||
Former [1984/28] | Dodd, Graham Marshall Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 55 Ipsley House Ipsley Church Lane Redditch Worcestershire P98 0TL / GB | ||
Former [1981/06] | Cundy, Anthony Brian Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O.Box 55 Ipsley House Ipsley Church Lane Redditch Worcestershire B98 0TL / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302455.3 | 21.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | GB19790027000 | 02.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7927000 | [1981/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023790 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023790 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/50 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
F16D13/583 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/06] | Title | German: | Reibkupplung | [1981/06] | English: | Friction clutch | [1981/06] | French: | Embrayage à friction | [1981/06] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 28.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.1986
11.03.1986
ADMISSIBLE LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau GmbH Industriestrasse 3 Postfach 1360 D-77803 Bühl / DE Opponent's representative Bardehle, Heinz, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.1986
11.03.1986
ADMISSIBLE LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau GmbH Industriestrasse 3 Postfach 1360 D-77803 Bühl / DE Opponent's representative Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | 11.03.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.07.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.07.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M08) | 09.04.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 02.10.1988 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1989/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.1981 | M02   Fee paid on   21.08.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1985 | AT | 21.07.1988 | SE | 22.07.1988 | BE | 31.07.1988 | CH | 31.07.1988 | LI | 31.07.1988 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/20] | AT | 21.07.1988 | |
SE | 22.07.1988 | ||
BE | 31.07.1988 | ||
CH | 31.07.1988 | ||
LI | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1990/43] | AT | 21.07.1988 | |
SE | 22.07.1988 | ||
BE | 31.07.1988 | ||
CH | 31.07.1988 | ||
LI | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1990/02] | AT | 21.07.1988 | |
SE | 22.07.1988 | ||
BE | 31.07.1988 | ||
CH | 31.07.1988 | ||
LI | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/46] | AT | 21.07.1988 | |
SE | 22.07.1988 | ||
BE | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/42] | SE | 22.07.1988 | |
BE | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/35] | SE | 22.07.1988 | |
BE | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 22.07.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | US2885047 [ ] (KEHRL HOWARD H); | US3385409 [ ] (SMIRL RICHARD L); | [A]DE1922603 (QUINTON HAZELL HOLDINGS LTD); | [A]GB1221761 (BARKAS WERKE VEB [DE]); | [A]FR2096290 (MULLER HERMANN GMBH); | [A]US3951393 (SMIRL RICHARD L); | DE2539474 [ ] (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) |