EP0027684 - Device for compressing a first member within a second member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1984 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1984 [1984/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans Louisiana 70160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/17] | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans, Louisiana 70160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adcock, Marty E. 179 North Street Logan Ohio 43138 / US | [1981/17] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/17] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302588.1 | 29.07.1980 | [1981/17] | Priority number, date | US19790086986 | 22.10.1979 Original published format: US 86986 | [1981/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0027684 | Date: | 29.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0027684 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027684 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G21C13/06, B25B29/02 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
B25B29/02 (EP,US);
G21C7/10 (EP,KR,US);
G21C13/06 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53687 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5383 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/52] | G21C13/06, B25B29/02 | ||
Former IPC [1981/17] | G21C7/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Eindrücken eines ersten Gliedes in ein zweites Glied | [1981/17] | English: | Device for compressing a first member within a second member | [1981/17] | French: | Dispositif de compression d'un premier membre dans le second membre | [1981/17] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/04] | 14.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2353769 (DIAMOND POWER SPECIALITY [US]); | [A]US3722332 (JONES C); | [A]CH400677 (ESCHER WYSS AG [CH]); | [A]US3749362 (O CONNOR J, et al); | [A]US2736219 ; | [A]US3162071 (BIACH JOHN L) |