EP0024168 - Panel support structure and article of furniture incorporating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.06.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1984 | Refusal of application | published on 08.08.1984 [1984/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worrallo, Anthony Charles 225 Great South Road Otahuhu Auckland 1006 / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [1981/08] | For all designated states Worrallo, Anthony Charles 225 Great South Road Otahuhu, Auckland 1006 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/08] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Duncan Alistair, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | [1981/08] | Application number, filing date | 80302705.1 | 07.08.1980 | [1981/08] | Priority number, date | NZ19400001912 | 08.08.1979 Original published format: NZ 191240 | [1981/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024168 | Date: | 25.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A47B47/05, F16B12/02 | [1981/08] | CPC: |
A47B47/05 (EP,US);
Y10T403/4602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/08] | Title | German: | Befestigungsstruktur für Platten und mit dieser Struktur versehenes Möbel | [1981/08] | English: | Panel support structure and article of furniture incorporating same | [1981/08] | French: | Structure de fixation pour panneaux et meuble comportant cette structure | [1981/08] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 09.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1984/32] | 09.03.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE501152 [ ] (SCHMIDT FA JULIUS); | GB991047 [ ] (VERSATILE FITTINGS W H S LTD, et al); | DE2214015 [ ] |