EP0026048 - Method of and means for controlling operation of electric devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1984 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Towmotor Corporation 7111, Tyler Boulevard Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/13] | For all designated states Towmotor Corporation 7111, Tyler Boulevard Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgartner, Kenneth A. 5511 N. Jesters Lane Peoria Illinois 61614 / US | 02 /
Melocik, Grant C. 313 Wilson Mills Road Chardon Ohio 44024 / US | 03 /
Stoller, Keith A. 416, Tyler Morton Illinois 61550 / US | [1981/13] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/13] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302892.7 | 21.08.1980 | [1981/13] | Priority number, date | WO1979US00738 | 11.09.1979 Original published format: PCT/US79/00738 | [1981/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026048 | Date: | 01.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026048 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/70, H02P7/28 | [1981/13] | CPC: |
H02P5/68 (EP,US);
H02P7/291 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Mittel zur Steuerung des Betriebes elektrischer Vorrichtungen | [1981/13] | English: | Method of and means for controlling operation of electric devices | [1981/13] | French: | Procédé et moyens pour commander l'opération de dispositifs électriques | [1981/13] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1980 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1209289 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]GB1239665 ; | [A]US3596154 (GURWICZ DAVID, et al); | [AD]US3707659 (APPELO HENDRIK C); | [AD]US4110668 (GURWICZ DAVID, et al); | [A]US4114047 (MELOCIK GRANT C) |