EP0024910 - Ignition plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1984 [1984/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinberg, Felix Giri 59 Vicarage Road London SW14 / GB | [1981/10] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | Carpenter, David, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302942.0 | 26.08.1980 | [1981/10] | Priority number, date | GB19790030650 | 04.09.1979 Original published format: GB 7930650 | [1981/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024910 | Date: | 11.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024910 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/50, H01T13/54 | [1981/10] | CPC: |
F02P9/00 (EP,US);
H01T13/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/10] | Title | German: | Zündkerze | [1981/10] | English: | Ignition plug | [1981/10] | French: | Bougie d'allumage | [1981/10] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/41] | 04.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.10.1983 | NL | 26.10.1983 | SE | 26.10.1983 | [1984/28] |
Former [1984/21] | BE | 26.10.1983 | |
SE | 26.10.1983 | ||
Former [1984/06] | SE | 26.10.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | US3521105 [ ] (FRANKS HARRY E); | [A]FR2219689 (SNECMA [FR]); | US3842818 [ ] (COWELL T, et al); | US3842819 [ ] (ATKINS F, et al); | [P]FR2437713 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]); | [E]EP0016647 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) |