EP0025315 - Devices for protecting garments and method of using them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.02.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith and Nephew Associated Companies p.l.c. 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states Smith and Nephew Associated Companies p.l.c. 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | ||
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states Smith and Nephew Associated Companies Limited 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lloyd, Ronald 63, Cambridge Road Sawbridgeworth, Hertfordshire / GB | [1981/11] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn Corporate Patents Department Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | Cole, William Gwyn, Dr. Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302975.0 | 28.08.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | GB19790029891 | 29.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7929891 | [1981/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025315 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025315 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0025315 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A41B9/12 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
A61F13/51405 (EP,US);
A61F13/51401 (EP,US);
A61F13/58 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15821 (EP,US);
A61F2013/4708 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51409 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5147 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530007 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530131 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1981/11] | A61F13/16, A41B9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen zum Schutz von Kleidung und Verfahren zu ihrer Verwendung | [1981/11] | English: | Devices for protecting garments and method of using them | [1981/11] | French: | Dispositifs pour la protection de vêtements et procédé pour leur utilisation | [1981/11] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/47] | 28.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1984
25.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Pohl, Hans Ludwig Hefnersplatz 3 8500 Nürnberg 11 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1984
25.11.1984
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Pohl, Hans Ludwig Hefnersplatz 3 D-8500 Nürnberg 11 / DE | ||
Former [1985/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1984
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 06.02.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.06.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.05.1989 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.1984 | BE | 08.02.1984 | CH | 08.02.1984 | IT | 08.02.1984 | LI | 08.02.1984 | NL | 08.02.1984 | SE | 08.02.1984 | [1999/42] |
Former [1985/25] | AT | 08.02.1984 | |
BE | 08.02.1984 | ||
CH | 08.02.1984 | ||
LI | 08.02.1984 | ||
NL | 08.02.1984 | ||
SE | 08.02.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | BE | 08.02.1984 | |
CH | 08.02.1984 | ||
LI | 08.02.1984 | ||
NL | 08.02.1984 | ||
SE | 08.02.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 08.02.1984 | |
CH | 08.02.1984 | ||
LI | 08.02.1984 | ||
SE | 08.02.1984 | ||
Former [1984/33] | CH | 08.02.1984 | |
LI | 08.02.1984 | ||
SE | 08.02.1984 | ||
Former [1984/27] | CH | 08.02.1984 | |
LI | 08.02.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | DE7203813U [ ]; | [X]FR2020570 (SCHMIDT WERNER); | DE6946200U [ ] (JOHANNA OSTERTAG [DE]); | [X]DE7002248U (JOHANNA OSTERTAG [DE]); | [D]US3570491 (SNEIDER VINCENT R); | [A]DE2628890 (FULLER H B CO) |