EP0026112 - Spinning machine information gathering apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.01.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARKS CRAMER COMPANY Newport Street P.O.Drawer 2200 Fitchburg Massachusetts 01420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/13] | For all designated states PARKS CRAMER COMPANY Newport Street P.O.Drawer 2200 Fitchburg Massachusetts 01420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lane, John Edgar 55 Fort Pond Hill Road Littleton Massachusetts 01460 / US | [1981/13] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/13] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 80303360.4 | 24.09.1980 | [1981/13] | Priority number, date | US19790077930 | 24.09.1979 Original published format: US 77930 | [1981/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026112 | Date: | 01.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026112 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | D01H13/32 | [1981/13] | CPC: |
D01H13/145 (EP,US);
D01H13/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Sammeln von von Spinnmaschinen kommenden Daten | [1981/13] | English: | Spinning machine information gathering apparatus and method | [1981/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour recueillir des informations provenant de machines de filature | [1981/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/49] | 21.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.10.1985
04.11.1985
ADMISSIBLE W. Schlafhorst & Co. Blumenberger Strasse 143 - 145 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1985/51] | 12.11.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.03.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.04.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.10.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1987/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/28] | GB | 24.09.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [D]US3680298 (SAUNDERS DAVID W); | DE2050514 [ ] (PARKS CRAMER CO [US]) | Examination | US4005392 |