EP0027323 - Derivatives of clavulanic acid, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): SE State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/16] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stirling, Irene 38 Harrison Close Reigate, Surrey / GB | 02 /
Clarke, Brian Peter "Coneybury", Drive Spur Forest Drive, Kingswood, Surrey / GB | [1981/16] | Representative(s) | Hesketh, Alan, et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/16] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr., et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80303363.8 | 25.09.1980 | [1981/16] | Priority number, date | GB19790033447 | 27.09.1979 Original published format: GB 7933447 | GB19790034761 | 06.10.1979 Original published format: GB 7934761 | [1981/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0027323 | Date: | 22.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027323 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, A61K31/42, // (C07D498/04, 205:00, 263:00) | [1981/16] | CPC: |
C07D503/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/16] | Title | German: | Clavulansäurederivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1981/16] | English: | Derivatives of clavulanic acid, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1981/16] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide clavulanique, procédés pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1981/16] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/30] | 26.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] | Request for further processing for: | 13.01.1983 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.1983 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.1983 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.03.1984 | BE | 14.03.1984 | SE | 14.03.1984 | CH | 30.09.1984 | LI | 30.09.1984 | LU | 30.09.1984 | [2003/06] |
Former [1999/52] | SE | 14.03.1983 | |
AT | 14.03.1984 | ||
BE | 14.03.1984 | ||
GB | 25.09.1984 | ||
CH | 30.09.1984 | ||
LI | 30.09.1984 | ||
LU | 30.09.1984 | ||
Former [1989/38] | SE | 14.03.1983 | |
AT | 14.03.1984 | ||
BE | 14.03.1984 | ||
GB | 25.09.1984 | ||
CH | 30.09.1984 | ||
LI | 30.09.1984 | ||
Former [1989/17] | SE | 14.03.1983 | |
AT | 14.03.1984 | ||
BE | 14.03.1984 | ||
CH | 30.09.1984 | ||
LI | 30.09.1984 | ||
Former [1985/25] | SE | 14.03.1983 | |
AT | 14.03.1984 | ||
BE | 14.03.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | SE | 14.03.1983 | |
BE | 14.03.1984 | ||
Former [1984/33] | SE | 14.03.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2747599 [ ] (GLAXO LAB LTD) |