EP0027734 - Dot matrix printing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1985 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1985 [1985/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ing. C. Olivetti & C., S.p.A. Via G. Jervis 77 10015 Ivrea / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/17] | For all designated states Ing. C. Olivetti & C., S.p.A. Via G. Jervis 77 I-10015 Ivrea / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernardis, Francesco Vacciana, 8B I-10010 Chiaverano (Torino) / IT | [1984/16] |
Former [1981/30] | 01 /
Bernardis, Francesco Vacciana, 8B I-10015 Ivrea (Turin) / IT | ||
Former [1981/17] | 01 /
Bernardis, Francesco Via San Pietro Martire, 1/D I-10015 Ivrea (Turin) / IT | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1981/17] | Application number, filing date | 80303686.2 | 17.10.1980 | [1981/17] | Priority number, date | IT19790069015 | 17.10.1979 Original published format: IT 6901579 | [1981/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0027734 | Date: | 29.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027734 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/02, B41J3/12 | [1981/17] | CPC: |
B41J25/001 (EP);
B41J2/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/17] | Title | German: | Punktmatrixdrucker | [1981/17] | English: | Dot matrix printing device | [1981/17] | French: | Imprimante à matrice de points | [1981/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 06.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3931761 [ ] (CARRUS ANDRE, et al); | US3945019 [ ] (UENO MASAAKI, et al); | US3976180 [ ] (JORIGNY GERARD ANDRE, et al); | US4059182 [ ] (GUSTAFSSON LARS AKE OLOF, et al); | US4153950 [ ] (NOSOWICZ EUGENE J, et al) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 21, No. 1, June 1978, Armonk (US) J.R. PIVNICHNY: "Matrix scan printing method" pages 103-104 | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 16, No. 5, October 1973, Armonk (US) F. TSUI: "Arrangement for data merging and line splitting in printers" pages 1594-1595 | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 21, no. 1, June 1978, ARMONK (US), J.R. PIVNICHNY: "Matrix scan printing method" pages 103-104 |