EP0030415 - Power steering gear with adjustable valve positioning pin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1985 [1985/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sheppard, Peter Harper 101 Philadelphia Street Hanover Pennsylvania 17331 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | For all designated states Sheppard, Peter Harper 101 Philadelphia Street Hanover Pennsylvania 17331 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/24] | Representative(s) | Houghton, David, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | Houghton, David, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 80303925.4 | 05.11.1980 | [1981/24] | Priority number, date | US19790097388 | 26.11.1979 Original published format: US 97388 | [1981/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030415 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030415 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/06 | [1981/24] | CPC: |
B62D5/24 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8671 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/24] | Title | German: | Servolenkgetriebe mit verstellbarem Ventilführungszapfen | [1984/28] | English: | Power steering gear with adjustable valve positioning pin | [1981/24] | French: | Direction assistée avec clavette de positionnement de soupape réglable | [1981/24] |
Former [1981/24] | Servolenkgetriebe mit verstellbarem Klepführungszapfen | Examination procedure | 08.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/10] | 15.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2941514 [ ] (ERICH JABLONSKY); | FR1463603 [ ] (JARMUEFEJLESZTESI INTEZET); | US4088063 [ ] (SHEPPARD RICHARD H); | US3092083 [ ] (SHEPPARD RICHARD H); | GB1541057 [ ] (CSEPELI AUTOGYAR, et al); | US3566751 [ ] (SHEPPARD RICHARD H) |