EP0030418 - Process for producing a non-woven fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/24] | Stentered bonded non woven fabric and process for producing same | ||
[1983/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1984 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1984 [1984/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1981/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Selwood, Alan Heighington Hall Heighington Nr Darlington Co Durham, DL5 6PN / GB | [1981/24] | Representative(s) | Hulse, Raymond, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | Hulse, Raymond, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 80303990.8 | 07.11.1980 | [1981/24] | Priority number, date | GB19790042317 | 07.12.1979 Original published format: GB 7942317 | [1981/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030418 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030418 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/74, D04H3/02 | [1981/24] | CPC: |
D04H1/435 (EP,US);
D04H1/50 (EP,US);
D04H1/55 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
D04H1/74 (EP,US);
D04H3/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines nicht gewebten Stoffes | [1983/18] | English: | Process for producing a non-woven fabric | [1983/18] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un non-tissé | [1983/18] |
Former [1981/24] | Gestrecktes, nicht gewebtes Material und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1981/24] | Stentered bonded non woven fabric and process for producing same | ||
Former [1981/24] | Non-tissé lié, étiré et procédé pour sa fabrication | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 20.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3993812 [ ] (DEBBAS SAMIR COSTANDI, et al); | FR1045194 [ ] (BRITISH CELLOPHANE LTD); | GB695805 [ ] (BRITISH CELLOPHANE LTD); | FR2303110 [ ] (DU PONT [US]); | GB1418227 [ ] (FREUDENBERG CARL); | US3652353 [ ] (BELISLE ALFRED E, et al); | DE2260677 [ ] (FREUDENBERG CARL FA) |