EP0031720 - Railroad car bogie [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1985 [1985/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMSTED Industries Incorporated 3700 Prudential Plaza Chicago, IL. 60601 / US | [1981/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mulcahy, Harry W. 1958 Mansard Blvd. Apt. 1-L Griffith Indiana 46319 / US | [1981/27] | Representative(s) | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/27] | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80304711.7 | 23.12.1980 | [1981/27] | Priority number, date | US19790108948 | 31.12.1979 Original published format: US 108948 | [1981/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0031720 | Date: | 08.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0031720 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031720 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/38 | [1981/27] | CPC: |
B61F5/38 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, SE [1981/27] | Title | German: | Drehgestell für Schienenfahrzeug | [1981/27] | English: | Railroad car bogie | [1981/27] | French: | Bogie pour véhicule ferroviaire | [1981/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/44] | 16.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3528374 (WICKENS ALAN HERBERT); | [AD]US3785298 (REYNOLDS D); | [AD]US3789770 (LIST H); | US3862606 [ ] (SCALES BRIAN T); | [AD]US4003316 (MONSELLE DALE E); | [AD]US4067261 (SCHEFFEL HERBERT); | [X]GB2021061 (AMSTED IND INC); | [X]GB2022042 (DRESSER IND); | [P]BE882533 (DRESSER IND) |