EP0032633 - Dual mounted bearings for fishing reel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.08.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION One Brunswick Plaza Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/30] | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION One Brunswick Plaza Skokie Illinois 60077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puryear, John W. 7272 East 101 Street South Tulsa Oklahoma 74133 / US | [1981/30] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/30] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80304763.8 | 30.12.1980 | [1981/30] | Priority number, date | US19800112913 | 17.01.1980 Original published format: US 112913 | [1981/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032633 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/01 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
A01K89/0102 (EP,US);
A01K89/00 (KR);
Y10T74/2165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/30] | Title | German: | Doppelt angebaute Lager für eine Angelrolle | [1981/30] | English: | Dual mounted bearings for fishing reel | [1981/30] | French: | Paliers montés de deux côtés pour un moulinet de pêche | [1981/30] | File destroyed: | 01.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/06] | 15.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/42] | 03.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.05.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/42] | 14.07.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3946963 [ ] (OBERG GARY R) |