EP0014621 - Coaxial cable with composite insulation for telecommunication, method for applying the external insulation of such a cable and apparatus for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/17] | Method for the outer insulating of coaxial cables and insulated coaxial cable for telecommunication | ||
[1984/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.1985 [1985/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES L.T.T. 1, rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste-Honorine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES L.T.T. 1, rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste-Honorine / FR | ||
Former [1980/17] | For all designated states LIGNES TELEGRAPHIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES Société anonyme 1 Rue Charles Bourseul F-78702 Conflans-Ste Honorine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girardon, Noel "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173 Boulevard Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Staath, Jean-Claude "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173 Boulevard Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1980/17] | Representative(s) | Guyot, Liliane, et al Thomson-CSF SCPI 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1984/04] |
Former [1980/17] | Guyot, Liliane Thomson-CSF SCPI 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400103.0 | 22.01.1980 | [1980/17] | Priority number, date | FR19790003440 | 12.02.1979 Original published format: FR 7903440 | [1980/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014621 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014621 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/00, H01B13/10 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
H01B13/0165 (EP);
H01B13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT [1980/17] | Title | German: | Koaxiales Kabel mit Verbundisolierung für das Fernmeldewesen, Verfahren für das Aufbringen der Aussenisolierung eines solchen Kabels und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1984/04] | English: | Coaxial cable with composite insulation for telecommunication, method for applying the external insulation of such a cable and apparatus for carrying out this method | [1984/04] | French: | Câble coaxial à isolation composite pour télécommunication, procédé de pose de l'isolation extérieure d'un tel câble et dispositif de mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1984/04] |
Former [1980/17] | Verfahren für das Aussenisolieren koaxialer Kabel und isoliertes koxiales Kabel für das Fernmeldewesen | ||
Former [1980/17] | Method for the outer insulating of coaxial cables and insulated coaxial cable for telecommunication | ||
Former [1980/17] | Procédé d'isolation extérieure de câbles coaxiaux et câble coaxial isolé pour télécommunication | Examination procedure | 13.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 27.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR873585 [ ]; | CH268956 [ ]; | US2372645 [ ]; | GB1059438 [ ]; | [D]FR2224844 |