|
22.02.1989 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1988 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1988 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.1988 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.06.1988 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.1988 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1987 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.12.1987 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1987 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.08.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1987 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.06.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.1987 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1987 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1986 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.07.1986 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.1986 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1985 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1985 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.03.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.02.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1985 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.02.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.06.1984 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1983 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1983 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.1983 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
21.04.1983 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.1983 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1983 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1983 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.01.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.1982 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.01.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1980 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1980 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.1980 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.1980 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.1980 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1980 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |