EP0015213 - Self supporting roof for buildings, composed of modular vaulted elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/18] | Self supporting roof for buildings, composed of modular elements | ||
[1984/22] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.12.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATIROC Zone Industrielle F-54920 Villers-la-Montagne / FR | [1980/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemaitre, Bernard 199, rue Caponière F-14000 Caen (Calvados) / FR | [1980/18] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Robert, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | [1980/18] | Application number, filing date | 80400257.4 | 22.02.1980 | [1980/18] | Priority number, date | FR19790004880 | 26.02.1979 Original published format: FR 7904880 | [1980/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015213 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015213 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/22] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0015213 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E04B7/00 | [1980/18] | CPC: |
E04B7/107 (EP,US);
E04B7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/18] | Title | German: | Aus gewölbeförmigen Modul-Elementen zusammengesetztes, selbsttragendes Dach für Gebäude | [1984/22] | English: | Self supporting roof for buildings, composed of modular vaulted elements | [1984/22] | French: | Toiture autoportante pour bâtiments, composée d'éléments modulaires en forme de voûte | [1984/22] |
Former [1980/18] | Aus Modul-Elementen zusammengesetztes, selbsttragendes Dach für Gebäude | ||
Former [1980/18] | Self supporting roof for buildings, composed of modular elements | ||
Former [1980/18] | Toiture autoportante pour bâtiments, composée d'éléments modulaires | Examination procedure | 31.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/11] | 11.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1985
23.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Greschbach Industrie GmbH & Co Stockfeldstrasse 5 D-7834 Herbolzheim / DE Opponent's representative Durm, Klaus Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.1985
23.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Greschbach Industrie GmbH & Co Stockfeldstrasse 5 D-7834 Herbolzheim / DE Opponent's representative Durm, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Klaus Durm Dipl.-Ing. Frank Durm Felix-Mottl-Strasse 1a D-76185 Karlsruhe / DE | 26.03.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.09.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.02.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05) | 15.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.12.1988 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1985 | AT | 22.02.1988 | SE | 23.02.1988 | CH | 29.02.1988 | NL | 01.09.1988 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/27] | AT | 22.02.1988 | |
SE | 23.02.1988 | ||
CH | 29.02.1988 | ||
NL | 01.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/21] | AT | 22.02.1988 | |
SE | 23.02.1988 | ||
NL | 01.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 22.02.1988 | |
NL | 01.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | NL | 01.09.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | US3335530 [ ] (HURD LESLIE A); | FR1494733 [ ] (ALUMINIUM FRANCAIS); | FR1558925 [ ]; | FR2028056 [ ] (PIERRE CLAUDE); | FR2116972 [ ] (LEONE PAUL); | FR2147866 [ ] (CAEN ATEL CONSTR METAL [FR]); | DE2846681 [ ] (ACMC EXPORT); | FR2407313 [ ] (CAEN ATEL CONSTR METAL [FR]) |