Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1985 [1985/44] |
10.08.1984 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.10.1984 [1984/41] |
14.06.1984 | Change - designated states | published on 15.08.1984 [1984/33] |
24.03.1982 | Change - applicant | published on 26.05.1982 [1982/21] |
20.02.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.04.1981 [1981/16] |
02.09.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.10.1980 [1980/22] |