Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0018256 | Global Dossier | 10.10.1984 | B1 | EP0018256 | 29.10.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR7909491 | 13.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8002229 | 02.12.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | FR7909491 | 13.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1149463 | 05.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | FR7909491 | 13.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3069399D1 | 15.11.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR7909491 | 13.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2454231 | 19.02.1982 | B1 | FR2454231 | 07.11.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR7909491 | 13.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL59800 | 30.07.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | FR7909491 | 13.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4326293 | 20.04.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | FR7909491 | 13.04.1979 |