EP0018256 - Transceiver with automatic switch-over control, and telecommunications network comprising such a transceiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1985 [1985/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deman, Pierre "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Pimentel, Albert "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
Ben Sadou, Jean-Claude "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 04 /
de Riviere, Charles "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 80400433.1 | 01.04.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | FR19790009491 | 13.04.1979 Original published format: FR 7909491 | [1980/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018256 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018256 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/46, H04B1/64 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
H04B1/64 (EP,US);
H04B1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/33] |
Former [1980/22] | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Sender-Empfänger mit automatischer Steuerung der Sende-Empfangsumschaltung und Fernmeldenetz, welches einen solchen Sender-Empfänger enthält | [1980/22] | English: | Transceiver with automatic switch-over control, and telecommunications network comprising such a transceiver | [1980/22] | French: | Emetteur-récepteur à commande automatique d'alternat, et réseau de télécommunications comportant un tel émetteur-récepteur | [1980/22] | File destroyed: | 16.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 09.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH461585 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY [CH]); | DE2128889 [ ] (TEKADE FELTEN & GUILLEAUME); | US3882458 [ ] (HOESCHELE JR DAVID F, et al) | [ ] - ELECTRON, Volume 29, No. 4, Avril 1973 Rotterdam (NL) J. HOEK: "De trio zendontvanger, serie 515", pages 160 a 164. * Page 160, colonne de gauche, lignes 11 a 12; colonne de droite, lignes 11 a 12; page 161, colonne de gauche, lignes 29 a 30; colonne de droite, lignes 1 a 7; page 162, colonne de gauche, lignes 33 a 41 et colonne de droite, lignes 14 a 22 * |